McFarlin v. Drew et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Dean McFarlin
Defendant: Clark, Drew and Irvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv00365
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ECF No. 27 ; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 24 is GRANTED; Clerk Directed to close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting ECF No. 8 IFP application; directing Clerk to e-serve this order and ECF No. 7 Complaint on the NV AG (NEFs sent 10/5/2017); directing that service be perfected within 90 days; directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff to serve defendants copies of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this action is to proceed on Count III against Defendant Drew, only; case STAYED 90 days to allow parties to settle their dispute before filing fee is paid; case referred to Inmate Early mediation Program to be schedule in subseq uent order; AG to file report form re 90 day stay results on or before 10/03/2017; if party seeks exclusion from inmate mediation program, party must file a motion to exclude case from mediation by 07/26/2017; directing Clerk to electro nically serve copy of this order, original screening order ECF No. 6 and Plaintiffs Complaint ECF No. 7 on AG (e-service of order and NEF regeneration of ECF No. 6 / 7 on 07/05/2017) ; directing AG to advise Court by 07/26/2017 whether i t will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendants for purpose of settlement; motion for appointment of counsel ECF No. 9 is denied. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 07/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying as moot ECF No. 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff AO 240 Form (mailed 5/22/2017); giving Plaintiff 28 days to file complete form or pay full $400 filing fee; directing Clerk to file complaint; permitting Count III to proceed against Defendant Drew, dismissing with leave to Amend Count II, dismissing without leave to amend Count IV and remaining portions of Count I; directing the docket to be amended to reflect Defendants Lt. Hartman and Correctional Officer Avila; dismissing Defendants Clark, Irvin, Hartman, and Avila; giving Plaintiff 28 days to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McFarlin v. Drew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Dean McFarlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?