Mitchell v. Baca et al
Petitioner: William Mitchell
Respondent: Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2016cv00384
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that the motion for reconsideration ECF No. 64 , motion for clarification ECF No. 70 , motion for order granting petitioner's supplement to motion for reconsideration ECF No. 71 , and motion to strike ECF No. 73 are all DENIED; the petition is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to comply with this courts order; a certificate of appealability is DENIED; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that petitioner's motion for extension of time to file a reply (ECF No. 66 ) is GRANTED; petitioner's reply to ECF No. 64 motion for reconsideration is due by 7/1/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that ECF Nos. 48 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, 50 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, 51 Motion for Leave to File a Second-Amended Petition, 55 / 61 Motions for Reconsideration are all DENIED; petitioner is expressly advised that failure to comply with order as set forth will result in the dismiss of petition. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying ECF No. 40 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; denying ECF No. 39 Motion for Order to Conduct Inquiry; granting ECF Nos. 42 and 45 Motion to Extend Time. Response to ECF No. 32 Order due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying Petitioner's ECF No. 28 Motion to File Amended Petition; granting Respondents' ECF No. 9 Motion to Dismiss as follows (see order for details); giving Petitioner 30 days to notify court re unexhausted grounds - if Petitioner elects to abandon, Respondents to answer remaining grounds within 30 days and Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter; granting Respondents' ECF No. 17 Motion to Partially Waive LR IA 10-3(e) and 10-3(i). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?