Shenna Corral et al v. HG Staffing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justine Bradley, Tiffany Carrera, Shenna Corral, Roxanne Primus, Brandi Smith and Whitney Vaughn
Defendant: HG Staffing, LLC and MEI-GSR Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00386
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:206 Collect Unpaid Wages
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDERED that this case is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is ordered to close the case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re ECF No. 76 Motion for Clarification (see order for details); giving Plaintiffs 30 days to withdraw their ECF No. 60 Motion to Dismiss or consent to the dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to voluntarily dismiss the action ECF No. 6 is GRANTED on the condition that it be with prejudice; Plaintiff have until 4/12/2019 to withdraw their motion or consent to the dismissal despite the condition; Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 61 is conditionally DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulation Re: 47 Motion to Stay Case. Replies due by 2/14/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EM)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 47 Motion to Stay Case due by Wednesday 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER approving ECF No. 42 Stipulation to Exceed Page Limit of Plaintiffs' Reply re ECF No. 35 Motion for Circulation of Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 35 Motion for Circulation of Notice due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 21 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint ECF No. 15 granting in part and denied in part; Plaintiff Corral is dismissed from this action; denying as moot ECF No. 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/01/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Because the current actions are related to Case No. 3:13-cv-00453-LRH-WGC and should have been so designated at the time of filing (of instant case)(LR 42-1(a)), the undersigned refers each of these cases to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 7/6/2016 to add reference to instant case (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shenna Corral et al v. HG Staffing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Bradley
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Carrera
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenna Corral
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Primus
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Smith
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Vaughn
Represented By: Joshua D Buck
Represented By: Leah Lin Jones
Represented By: Mark R. Thierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HG Staffing, LLC
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEI-GSR Holdings LLC
Represented By: Chris William Davis
Represented By: H. Stan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?