Slaughter v. Escamilla et al

Plaintiff: Rickie Slaughter
Defendant: Renee Baker, Escamilla, Sandra Rose and Donald Southworth
Case Number: 3:2016cv00457
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 115 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 107 Motion for Summary Judgment due by Friday 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's ECF No. 94 Objection. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting ECF No. 76 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Escamilla (ECF No. 68 ). Response/opposition due by 7/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 57 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Discovery Request to Melissa Travis. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ruling on ECF Nos. 46 Motion to Compel and 47 Motion for Sanctions. See Order for specific details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion ECF No. 43 is GRANTED; Clerk directed to FILE Second Amended Complaint ECF No. 43 at 6-21; AG to file notice re acceptance of service and last known address of defendants not accepti ng service by 4/9/2018; after service is completed, defendants will have TWENTY-ONE DAYS to file answer/response. SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 7/24/2018. Dispostive Motions due by 8/23/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting ECF No. 37 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Discovery Responses. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING as moot ECF No. 24 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiffs application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG (attention: Trac i Plotnick) with this order and the ECF No. 4 Complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 08/07/2017); service must be perfected by 11/05/2017; directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re acceptance of service; if service cannot be accepted, pl aintiff to file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and address for the defendant(s); if AG accepts service for any named defendant(s), an answer or other response to the compla int due within 60 days; Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Escamilla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escamilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Southworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?