McNair v. Berg
Plaintiff: Clarence McNair
Defendant: L. Berg
Case Number: 3:2016cv00487
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting ECF No. 38 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILLIAM G. COBB ECF No. 25 is adopted and accepted in full; ECF No. 19 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for a Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDERED ECF No. 1 IFP Application is GRANTED, however the full filing fee must be paid. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND this order to Finance and NDOC Inmate Services. (E-service to Finance, mail to NDOC 8/17/2017.) Clerk shall SERVE this order and ECF No. 6 Complaint on AG. (E-service 8/17/2017; # 6 NEF re complaint regenerated.) AG shall file notice by 9/7/2017 re acceptance of service; and file address(es) under seal for Ds for which service not accepted. P sh all file a motion re unserved Ds. If service accepted, answer due by 10/16/2017. Henceforth P shall serve D a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Case from Mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNair v. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Berg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence McNair
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?