Entsminger v. Aranas et al.
Plaintiff: Gregory West Entsminger
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, V. Austin, Isidro Baca, Robert Bannister, Barbra Cegavske, Andrew Clinger, James Cox, James Dzurenda, Linda Grankowski, Damien Haycock, Teri Jacobs, Marsha Johns, John Keast, Kramer, Adam Laxalt, Catherine Masto, Melanie McBroom, E.K. McDaniel, Secretary of State Ross Miller, Melissa Mitchell, Jeff Mohlenkamp, Shannon Moyle, Monica Navarro, Jack Palmer, John Peery, Mardile Peterson, Wallace Remson, Kathleen Reynolds, Ileene Sanborne, Brian Sandoval, Pauline Simmons, Sandy Snider, Alisha Unknown, Annie Unknown, Candice Unknown, Caroline Unknown, Dave Unknown, Jenifer Unknown, Laura Unknown, Missy Unknown, Sunshine Unknown, VanHorn, Lisa Walsh, Mike Wilden and Gene Yup
Case Number: 3:2016cv00555
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Late Objections (ECF No. 284 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Objections (ECF No. 284 -1) are overruled. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Defendants have not Complied with (ECF No. 256 ) Court's Order" (ECF No. 266 ) is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's "Motion to Change th e Court's Scheduling Order in (ECF No. 256 ) for Summary Judgement (sic) Response and Reply" (ECF No. 275 ) is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff shall have to and including Friday, January 22, 2021, to file his response and Defendants sha ll have to and including Friday, February 12, 2021, to file a reply memorandum. THERE SHALL BE NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall administratively dismiss Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Errata (ECF Nos. 209 , 211 ) and re-file them as of this date. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER - Clerk shall issue summonses for Jennifer Link and Alisha Fanyo and send the same to the U.S. Marshal with the addresses provided under seal (ECF No. 259 ), two (2) copies of the Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 18 ), two (2) copi es of the Court's Screening Order (ECF No. 21 ), and two (2) copies of this order for service on the Defendants (Electronic Service to USM on 10/27/2020). Plaintiff shall have to and including Friday, November 20, 2020, in which to effect service on Defendants Link and Fanyo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER - The Court construes Plaintiff's Notice (ECF No. 246 ) as a Motion for Reconsideration and grants the motion. Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. 235 ) is overruled. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER - Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. 235 ) is overruled. Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 225 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 205 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety.Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment (ECF No. 165 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 203 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Dismissal of Dental Assistant Jennifer (ECF No. 179 ) is granted. P laintiff is given 30 days from the date of this order to file a proof of service on Defendant Jennifer, otherwise failure to do so will result in her dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 195 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety. Plaintiff's Motion to Include the State of Nevada as a Named Defendant (ECF No. 174 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 191 ) is denied in part and granted in part as discussed herein.Plaintiff's Objections (ECF No. 178 ) are overruled. This Court's Order (ECF No. 190 ) stands. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER that Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 178 ) is overruled; Plaintiff's motion to file supplement (ECF No. 181 ) is denied as moot; Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a reply (ECF No. 189 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER - Defendant Sunshine Flores' Motion to Set Aside Clerks Default (ECF No. 168 ) is GRANTED. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Default Judgment against Flores (ECF No. 149 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 124 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the court's CM/ECF docket currently only lists the new State officials. The Clerk shall REVISE the docket to reflect that Minev, Sisolak, Ford, White, a nd Cates are defendants in their official capacities only, and that Aranas, Sandoval, Laxalt, and Clinger remain defendants in their individual capacities only. With respect to Willden, the screening order (ECF No. 21 ) allowed Plainti ff to proceed against Willden in September of 2018, and the summons was returned unexecuted as to Willden nearly a year later on August 16, 2019. To date, Plaintiff has not successfully served Willden; therefore, Willden will be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/24/2020.. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting ECF No. 148 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 102 Order. Dispositive Motions due by June 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying 126 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and addressing 119 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend the Discovery Deadline. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER that the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 120 ) is accepted and adopted in its entirety; Plaintiff's emergency motion for temporary restraining order (ECF No. 118 ) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting ECF No. 94 Plaintiff's Motion-Suggestion to Substitute Names of Defendants under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d); the AG's Office shall file a notice by 9/9/2019 re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information for defendants under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting ECF No. 75 Motion For Extension of Time to Provide Declaration of Defendant Walsh. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying ECF No. 63 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account; Clerk directed to send a copy of this order to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (E-service to Finance and mailed to NDOC C hief on 2/11/2019); Clerk directed to electronically SERVE NV AG with a copy of this order and a copy of ECF No. 18 Plaintiff's second amended complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 2/11/2019); service must be perfected by 5/12/2019; AG to advise Court by 3/4/2019 re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; plaintiff to file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and address for the defendant(s); answer/response due within 60 days for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; this case is no longer stayed. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entsminger v. Aranas et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbra Cegavske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Clinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Grankowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damien Haycock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teri Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Keast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie McBroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Ross Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Mohlenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Peery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mardile Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace Remson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ileene Sanborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisha Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annie Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenifer Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missy Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VanHorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Wilden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Yup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory West Entsminger
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?