Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation v. Micron Optics, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation
Defendant: Micron Optics, Inc.
Counter Defendant: Robert L. Citroen and Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation
Counter Claimant: Micron Optics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00570
Filed: October 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER granting ECF No. 91 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing Joint Pretrial Order (First Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 73 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 76 ) is DENIED; and Clerk shall correct the docket to reflect that ECF No. 77 is not a motion. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting ECF No. 83 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file replies to ECF Nos. 73 , 76 , and 77 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 2/8/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF Nos. 73 , 76 , and 77 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due 1/11/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting Defendant's request for fees incurred in connection with its Motion to Compel 42 . ROBERT L. CITROEN, LAW CORPORATION and ROBERT L. CITROEN are ordered to pay Micron $5,831.85 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Microns Motion to Compel ECF No. 42 is GRANTED. Micron's request for reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred in connectionwith this motion is granted. Micron shall file a document setting forth the reasonable expenses requested on or before 09/08/2017. Citroen has until 09/20/2017 to file a response. Micron will then have until 09/27/2017, to file a reply, if necessary. See Order for further details and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying ECF No. 13 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation v. Micron Optics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robert L. Citroen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation
Represented By: Stephen S Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Micron Optics, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Represented By: Montgomery Y Paek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micron Optics, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Sandra Ketner
Represented By: Montgomery Y Paek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Citroen, Law Corporation
Represented By: Stephen S Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?