Sharkozy v. Terra-Gen Operating Company, Inc. et al

Defendant: Beowawe Power, LLC, Terra-Gen Operating Company, Inc. and Terra-Gen Power, LLC
Plaintiff: Mark Sharkozy
Case Number: 3:2016cv00592
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re ECF No. 30 Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying ECF No. 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 12, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Based on the parties stipulation 20 and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is returned to the CLERK OF COURT for random REASSIGNMENT to a district and magistrate judge in the unofficial Northern District. All scheduled hearings are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on to correct text - 10/12/2016 (DL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharkozy v. Terra-Gen Operating Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beowawe Power, LLC
Represented By: Dan C. Bowen
Represented By: Ann O. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra-Gen Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: Dan C. Bowen
Represented By: Ann O. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra-Gen Power, LLC
Represented By: Dan C. Bowen
Represented By: Ann O. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Sharkozy
Represented By: Trevor J. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?