Sawyer v. Baker et al
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Warden Baker
Petitioner: Airell Joshua Thomas Sawyer
Case Number: 3:2016cv00627
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery must be completed by January 11, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery must be completed by October 12, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time (ECF No. 58 ) is granted. Discovery must be complete by July 13, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDERED that deponent Bryan Tully's motion to quash subpoena (ECF No. 49 ) is denied without prejudice. It is further ordered that Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time in which to complete discovery (ECF No. 52 ) is granted. Discovery must be completed within 90 days of the disposition of Petitioner's motion to compel filed in the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED the motion to quash subpoena, filed by Stephen M. Hess, Esq. (ECF No. 39 ) is granted. Respondents' motion for clarification (ECF No. 42 ) is denied. The unopposed motion to extend time to complete discovery (ECF No. 40 ) is granted. Discovery must be completed by 12/16/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Petitioner's motion for leave to file second amended petition under seal ECF No. 23 is granted; public version of the second amended petition, with all confidential information redacted, due by 10/24/2018; Petitione r's motion for leave to conduct discovery and for court order to obtain documents and conduct depositions ECF No. 27 is granted; Petitioner's motion for an evidentiary hearing ECF No. 29 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 30 , 31 Motions to Extend Time : Responses to ECF Nos. 27 Motion for discovery, and 29 Motion for hearing are due by 3/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Petitioner's request for leave to file a second amended petition (ECF No. 11 ) is denied as moot. Petitioner's corrected motion for leave to file a second amended petition (ECF No. 13 ) is granted. Amended Petition due by 5/9/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Airell Joshua Thomas Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?