Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Wingfield Springs Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Thunder Properties Inc., Westland Construction Corp. and Wingfield Springs Community Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv00632
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting ECF No. 52 Stipulation to Extend Time: Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 34 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting ECF No. 40 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Replies in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. The deadline for Deutsche Bank to file its reply to HOA's Response shall be extended to 14 days after Thunder's response to the motion for summary judgment is filed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting ECF No. 38 Stipulation : Defendnats Thunder Properties, Inc.'s, and Wingfield Springs Community Association's Response to ECF No. 34 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/15/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. 34 Motion for Summary Judgment: Defendants' Thunder Properties Inc. and Wingfield Springs Community Association's responses due by 10/31/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying ECF No. 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Wingfield Springs Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Michael S. Kelley
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thunder Properties Inc.
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westland Construction Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingfield Springs Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?