Slaughter v Baker et al
Petitioner: Rickie Slaughter
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Case Number: 3:2016cv00721
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting ECF No. 129 Motion to Extend Time. Replies due by 8/30/2024. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 6/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time (fourth request) (ECF No. 125 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have up to and including April 19, 2024, to file their answer to the remaining grounds in Petitioner Rickie Slaughter's Fourth-Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/26/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting ECF No. 123 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have up to and including March 22, 2024, to file their answer to the remaining grounds in Petitioner Rickie Slaughter's fourth-amended petition. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/23/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting ECF No. 121 Motion to Extend Time: Respondents will have up to and including February 22, 2024, to file their answer to the remaining grounds in Petitioner Rickie Slaughter's fourth-amended petition (ECF No. 91 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/12/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDERED that Respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time (first request) (ECF No. 119 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have up to and including January 8, 2024, to file their answer to the remaining grounds in Petitioner Rickie Slaughter's fourth amended petition (ECF No. 91 ). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDERED that Respondents' motion to dismiss [ECF No. 105 ] is granted, in part, as detailed herein. Pursuant to this Court's scheduling order [ECF No. 90], Respondents have 90 days from the date of this order (11/7/2023) in which to file an answer to the remaining grounds in the fourth-amended petition (ECF No. 91 ). Slaughter will then have 45 days following the filing of an answer to file a reply. Clerk is directed to substitute Brian Williams for Respondent Renee Baker Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 113 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents will have up to and including July 28, 2023, to file their reply to Petitioner's opposition to their motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting ECF No. 110 Motion to Extend Time (Third Request). Petitioner's Response/Opposition due by 6/21/2023 as to ECF No. 105 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 108 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner's Response/Opposition due by 5/22/2023 as to ECF No. 105 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Motion to Extend Time (First Request). Petitioner's Response/Opposition due by 4/20/2023 as to ECF No. 105 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting ECF No. 102 Motion to Extend Time : Respondents will have up to and including January 19, 2023, to file their response to the Fourth Amended Petition (ECF No. 91 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER - Respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time (third request) (ECF No. 96 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have up to and including January 5, 2023, to file their response to the Fourth Amended Petition (ECF No. 91 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER - Respondents' unopposed motion for extension of time (second request) (ECF No. 94 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have up to and including November 21, 2022, to file their response to the Fourth Amended Petition (ECF No. 91 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/7/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting ECF No. 92 Motion to Extend Time (First Request). Respondents will have up to and including October 7, 2022 (10/7/2022), to file their response to the Fourth Amended Petition (ECF No. 91 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authorities (ECF No. 76 ) is denied. Respondents' Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule Pending Conclusion of Petitioner's State Court Proceedings (ECF No. 75 ) is granted. Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Stay Case and Hold in Abeyance (ECF No. 79 ) is granted. This action is stayed pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims. Petitioner shall return to this Court with a Motion to Reopen within 45 days of issuance of the remittitur by the Nevada Supreme Court at the conclusion of the State Court proceedings. Petitioner or Respondents otherwise may move to reopen the action and seek any relief appropriate under the circumstances. Clerk shall administratively close this action until such time as the Court grants a Motion to Reopen the action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDERED that the respondents must file and serve a response to the emergency motion for release (ECF No. 68 ) within 5 days of the date that this order is entered (5/18/2020). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Slaughter must file his reply, if any, within 3 days of the date that the respondents file their response. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDERED that respondents' unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 66 ) is GRANTED. Respondents will have up to and including May 22, 2020, to file a response to the third amended petition (ECF No. 64 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting ECF No. 60 Motion to Extend Time; granting ECF No. 61 Motion for Leave; Third Amended Petition due within 7 days; Response to the third amended petition due within 60 days; Reply due 30 days thereafter. See order pdf for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Extend Time. The deposition of Marc DiGiacomo must be completed by the end of 7/29/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that petitioner's second motion for discovery (ECF No. 40 ) is GRANTED; the certification requirements of Rules 26(c)(1) and 37(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule LR 26-7 apply to any disputes regarding t he discovery allowed; petitioner's motion for leave to file a second amended petition (ECF No. 50 ) is GRANTED; Petitioner shall file a notice or motion as outlined in order within 60 days from the date of the deposition. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that ECF No. 45 petitioner's motion for extension of time (first request) is GRANTED. Petitioner need not file any appropriate motion post-discovery until after the court resolves petitioner's second motion for leave to conduct discovery (ECF No. 40 ). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting ECF No. 43 Motion for an Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 40 Motion for leave to conduct discovery. Responses due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 37 Motion to Extend Time : Discovery due by 5/17/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Motion for extension of time to take discovery (first request). Discovery must be completed by 4/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDERED that petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time (ECF No. 12 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to conduct discovery and for court order to obtain documents and depositions (ECF No. 28 ) is GRANTED. Discovery shall be completed by 1/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED that the IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED. P's motion for leave to submit/file a longer than usual petition (ECF No. 3 ) is GRANTED. Clerk shall file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus P's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 2 ) is GRANTED. FPD is provisionally appointed to represent P. FPD shall until 1/19/2017 to undertake direct representation of P or to indicate inability to do so. If representation undertaken then amended petition due b y 2/18/2017. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for Rs. Clerk shall electronically serve both the AG and the FPD a copy of the petition and a copy of this order. (E-service 12/20/2016.) AG shall enter a notice of appearance by 1/9/2017, but no furt her response shall be required from respondents until further order of the court. Any exhibits filed shall be filed with separate index as specified herein. A hard copy of any additional state court exhibits shall be forwarded to the Las Vegas staff attorneys. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/20/2016. (Copy of order mailed to P at ESP on 12/20/2016.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Represented By: Michael Bongard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Michael Bongard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rickie Slaughter
Represented By: Jeremy Charles Baron
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?