STRICT SCRUTINY MEDIA, CO. v. City of Reno
Plaintiff: Strict Scrutiny Media, Co.
Defendant: Reno, City Of
Case Number: 3:2016cv00734
Filed: December 17, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that Reno's motion for summary judgment ECF No. 70 is granted; SSM's motion for partial summary judgment ECF No. 71 is denied; SSM's motion for leave to file supplemental authority ECF No. 88 is denied as moot; Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of the City of Reno and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting ECF No. 76 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 70 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 40 Motion to Dismiss and denying without prejudice ECF No. 47 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDERED that Defendant City of Reno's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 20 ) is granted. Plaintiffs are granted leave to amend their complaint within 30 days. Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 5 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. 15 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 12 Response re ECF No. 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 2/3/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRICT SCRUTINY MEDIA, CO. v. City of Reno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City Of
Represented By: Chandeni K Sendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strict Scrutiny Media, Co.
Represented By: Frank C Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?