Hermansen v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Branden J. Hermansen
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2017cv00135
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - Respondents' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 28 ) is granted. Hermansen's First Amended Petition (ECF No. 20 ) is dismissed with prejudice as time-barred. A certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter final judgment accordingly, in favor of Respondents and against Hermansen, dismissing this action with prejudice and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that Hermansen's motion for leave to file exhibits under seal (ECF No. 40 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: 1. Exhibits 21, 22, and 27 (ECF Nos. 42 , 42 -1, 42 -6) are considered properly filed under seal. 2. The Clerk of Court is instructed to UNSEAL Exhibits 23, 24, 25, and 26 (ECF Nos. 42 -2, 42 -3, 42 -4, 42 -5). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting ECF No. 50 Motion to Extend Time : Reply to ECF No. 38 Response re ECF No. 28 Motion to Dismiss due by 5/21/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - Respondents' motion for extension of time (ECF No. 44 ) is granted. Respondents will have until May 17, 2019, to file a reply to the opposition (ECF No. 38 ) to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 28 ). Petitioner's motion for leave to file excess pages (ECF No. 39 ) is also granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting ECF No. 36 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 28 Motion to Dismiss due by 4/10/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. 34 Unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to ECF No. 28 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/27/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Petitioner's second unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 32 ) is granted. Petitioner will have until February 25, 2019, to respond to Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 28 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 30 ) is granted. Petitioner will have until January 11, 2019, to respond to Respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 28 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that ECF No. 26 Respondents' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a response to ECF No. 20 amended petition for writ of habeas corpus is granted. Response/answer due by 11/13/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Petitioner's ECF No. 22 Motion for Leave to File Exhibit 1 Under Seal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting ECF No. 18 Motion for an extension of time. Amended Petition due by 7/25/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting ECF No. 16 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time; Amended Petition due by 6/25/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re ECF No. 13 Notice of Appearance by FPD. Petitioner has until 3/27/2018 to file an amended petition; response/answer to the petition due within 60 days thereafter; reply/opposition due 30 days after service of answer; any additional state court record exhibits filed herein; parties shall send copies of all exhibits to the Reno Clerk's Office. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that petitioner's application ECF No. 1 to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot; the Clerk directed to file the petition and accompanying papers; motion for appointment of counsel ECF No. 1 -2 is granted; pe titioners motion for leave to file memorandum ECF No. 1 -3 is granted; FPD will be appointed as counsel and will have (30) days to undertake direct representation or indicate to the court the inability to represent petitioner; Clerk directed to add AG, as counsel for respondents; AG to file notice of appearance by 11/16/2017; Clerk to send a copy of order to petitioner, AG, FPD and CJA Coordinator (mailed to petitioner and e-service on 10/26/2017); Clerk directed to provide copies of all prior filings to both AG and FPD (NEF regenerated on 10/26/2017). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hermansen v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Branden J. Hermansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?