Turner v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Jeremy Turner
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2017cv00139
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER that Petitioner's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF Nos. 27 , 27 -1) is denied; Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability; Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 56 Petitioner's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Supplemental Points and Authorities; Supplemental reply to Respondent's answer due by 8/23/2019; Respondent's response to Petitioner's reply and any supplemental reply to their answer due by 9/22/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Enlargement of Time (ECF No. 54 ) is granted. Petitioner will have until and including July 19, 2019, to file his reply to Respondents' answer. Respondents' Motion for Clarification (ECF No. [4 7]) and Supplement to Motion for Clarification (ECF No. 49 ) are denied, as moot. Petitioner's Request for Reconsideration regarding his Fourth Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF No. 48 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting ECF No. 45 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time to file an answer to the amended petition (ECF No. 27 ); Respondents answer due by 3/21/2019; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order entered April 4, 2017 (ECF No. 5 ) will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel ECF No. 41 and Motion for Enlargement of Time ECF No. 42 are denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting ECF No. 37 for Enlargement of Time to file answer to ECF No. 27 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in ECF No. 5 Order remain in effect. Respondents' answer due 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Respondents to have until 1/3/2019 to file their answer; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceeding set forth in ECF No. 5 Order will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 29 Motion to Dismiss; denying ECF No. 32 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; Respondents to file answer to amended habeas petition by 11/18/2018; in all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order ECF No. 5 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that respondents' answer/response to the amended petition ECF No. 27 is due by 3/21/2018; all other respects the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order ECF No. 5 , will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting petitioners motion to amend petition for writ of habeas corpus ECF No. 21 ; petitioner will have until 12/16/2017 to file an amended petition; Clerk to send petitioner, along with a copy of this order, three copies of the blank form for a petition for writ of habeas corpus (mailed on 10/17/2017); respondents motion to dismiss is denied as moot; petitioners motion for enlargement of time ECF No. 24 is denied. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner will have until and including 09/22/2017 to respond to ECF No. 10 Motion to Dismiss. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in ECF No. 5 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 07/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Clerk to file petition and motions, to add NV AG as counsel for respondents, and to e-serve NV AG with petition and this order (NEFs sent 4/4/2017). Appearance in action and response to petition due within 60 days. Reply due within 60 days thereafter. The Motion for Leave to File Longer than Normal Petition is denied as unnecessary and moot. The Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?