Edwards v. Wolfson et al
Petitioner: Carl D. Edwards
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Steven Wolfson
Case Number: 3:2017cv00148
Filed: March 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDERED that the clerk of the court STRIKE the ex parte motion for emergency hearing (ECF No. 37 ) and the motion for appointment of counsel for A.D.A. claims (ECF No. 38 ). Signed by District Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER that petitioner's "Petition for C.O.A. from Nevada Supreme Court's Summary Dismissal of Criminal Appeal 16-69746 and for Order to Produce via Televideo from NDOC" (ECF No. 25 ) is DENIED; petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 24 ) is DENIED; a certificate of appealability will not issue; Clerk directed to send petitioner a copy of the docket sheet (Mailed to P on 8/6/2019). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that petitioner's objections (ECF No. 12 ) are DENIED; petitioner's request for docket sheet and for subpoenas (ECF No. 13 ) is GRANTED in part; Clerk directed to send petitioner a copy of the docket sheet (mailed to P at ESP on 9/25/2018); In all other respects, the request (ECF No. 13 ) is DENIED; petitioner's request for federal subpoenas (ECF No. 14 ) is DENIED; petitioner's request for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 15 ) is DENIED; this action is DISMISSED with prejudice because it is untimely; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this action; a certificate of appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER giving Petitioner 30 days to file fully complete IFP application or pay $5 filing fee; directing Clerk to send Petitioner blank IFP application (mailed 4/6/2017). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Wolfson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carl D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?