Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al v. Highland Ranch Homeowners Association et al

Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Airmotive Investments, LLC and Highland Ranch Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2017cv00287
Filed: May 4, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part ECF No. 13 Motion to Dismiss. This matter is STAYED pending resolution of the parallel state-court proceeding. ECF No. 30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 28, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 24 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at the October 3 case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 13, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING without prejudice ECF No. 18 Motion to appear telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al v. Highland Ranch Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airmotive Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highland Ranch Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Rex Garner
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?