O'Doan v. Sanford et al
Plaintiff: James O'Doan
Defendant: Cade Leavitt, Reno, City of and Joshua Sanford
Case Number: 3:2017cv00293
Filed: May 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 39 ) is GRANTED; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting ECF No. 43 Motion for Leave to File exhibits under seal. Exhibit 13 and Exhibit 14 to ODoan's response (ECF No. 42 ) may be filed and may remain under seal. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting ECF No. 46 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 42 Response re ECF No. 39 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/14/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting ECF No. 40 Stipulation Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to EFC No. 39 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's response due by 4/24/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING without prejudice ECF No. 26 Stipulation : The parties may amend their stipulation on or before September 27, 2017 to comply with Local Rule 26-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/20/2017 to denote without prejudice (DRM).
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting ECF No. 13 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference (First Request). Case Management Conference continued to 8/3/2017 at 10:00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 06/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Doan v. Sanford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cade Leavitt
Represented By: Mark A. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City of
Represented By: Mark A. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Sanford
Represented By: Mark A. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Doan
Represented By: Luke Andrew Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?