Coleman v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Steve Coleman
Defendant: Haskell, K. Johnson, Kelly, Robinson and Rynerson
Case Number: 3:2017cv00310
Filed: May 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Scheduling a Settlement Conference for 7/11/2019 at 9:00AM in Reno Fifth Floor Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. The settlement conference statements shall be received in the Reno Clerk's Office not later than 4:00 PM on 7/5/2019. DO NOT DELIVER OR MAIL THEM TO THE CLERKS OFFICE; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 5/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff's "Answer to Defendants' Answer to the Plaintiff's Civil Complaint" (ECF No. 23 ) is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); Clerk directed to e-serve a copy of this order and Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. 4 on AG (e-service of order and NEF regeneration of ECF No. 4 on 9/7/2018); directing AG to advise Court by 9/28/2018 re acceptance of service; if service cannot be accepted, Plaintiff shall file a motion identifying the unserved defendants(s), requesting issuance of a summons and specifying full name/address of the defendant(s); answer/response due by 11/06/2018 for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants a copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; this case no longer stayed. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that pursuant to ECF No. 3 Screening Order, this case to proceed against Defendants Robinson, Rynerson, Johnson, Kelly and Haskell; case STAYED 90 days to allow parties to settle their dispute before filing fee is paid; AG to file rep ort form re 90 day stay results on or before 8/22/2018; if party seeks exclusion from inmate mediation program, party must file a motion to exclude case from mediation by 6/14/2018; directing Clerk to electronically SERVE copy of this o rder, original screening order ECF No. 3 and Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. 4 on AG (e-service of order and NEF regeneration of ECF No. 3 / 4 on 5/24/2018); directing AG to advise Court by 6/14/2018 whether it will enter a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendants for purpose of settlement. See order for further details and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haskell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?