Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Fuller Jenkins Clarkson, P.C., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and The Foothills At Wingfield Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2017cv00332
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting ECF No. 86 Stipulation to Dismiss Litigation With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDERED that Wells Fargo's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 44 ) is DENIED. SFR's cross motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 48 ) joined by Foothills (ECF No. 52 ) is GRANTED. SFR's motion to strike (ECF No. 61 ), joined by Foothills (ECF No. 67 ), is DENIED as moot. Wells Fargo's Notice of Lis Pendens (ECF No. 3 ) is hereby expunged. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this order and close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Replies in Support of ECF Nos. 48 Motion for Summary Judgment and 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 58 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to Defendant The Foothills at Wingfield Homeowners Association's Response (ECF No. 51 ) to Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 44 ). Reply due by 6/11/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting ECF No. 55 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to ECF No. 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Stipulation to Extend Time To Respond to Wells Fargo's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 44 ) and SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 48 ). Responses due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting ECF No. 40 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 23 Motion to Dismiss. It is granted as to claim four, claim five, and claim seven, which are DISMISSED without prejudice. It is denied as to the remaining claims, which survive the instant motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/08/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying ECF No. 9 Motion for Demand for Security for Costs. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuller Jenkins Clarkson, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Jacqueline A. Gilbert
Represented By: Karen L. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Foothills At Wingfield Homeowners Association
Represented By: Christopher D Phipps
Represented By: Alan W Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Michael Paretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?