Youtoo Technologies, LLC v. Twitter, Inc.

Plaintiff: Youtoo Technologies, LLC
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Interested Party: Strategic Gaming Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00414
Filed: July 10, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 Defendant's Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 29, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to compel will be held in abeyance. SGM is directed to file and serve by 9/12/2017 a declaration from SGM's ninety-nine percent owner, Grant Lincoln, addressing the issues specified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 7, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 6 Motions to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youtoo Technologies, LLC v. Twitter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Strategic Gaming Management, LLC
Represented By: Sydney Gambee
Represented By: Joseph G. Went
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twitter, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Adam K Yowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youtoo Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?