Crites v. Fox News Network, LLC
Plaintiff: Austyn D Crites
Defendant: Fox News Network, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00489
Filed: August 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE on ECF No. 111 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting ECF No. 103 Unopposed Motion re ECF No. 98 Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting ECF No. 47 Withdrawal of Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crites v. Fox News Network, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austyn D Crites
Represented By: Thomas P Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox News Network, LLC
Represented By: Scott A Glogovac
Represented By: Dori Ann Hanswirth
Represented By: Theresa M. House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?