Myles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angela Y. Myles
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2017cv00524
Filed: August 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 20 ) is adopted and accepted, and Plaintiff's Motion for Reversal and/or Remand (ECF No. 14 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Cro ss-motion to Affirm (ECF No. 17 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED for further administrative proceedings consistent with the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 20 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in this matter. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. 12 Stipulation for extension of time for plaintiff to file motion for summary judgment and/or remand. Motion due by 12/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ECF No. 1 IFP Application is GRANTED. The complaint shall PROCEED. Clerk shall FILE the complaint (ECF 1 -1). Clerk shall SERVE Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail to: Regional Chief Counsel; and U. S. Attorney General (Cert Mail Nos. 7013 1710 0001 6894 4994, 7013 1710 0001 6894 5007). Clerk shall ISSUE a summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver summons and complaint for service by USM on U.S. Attorneys Office, Reno. (Summons and complaint to USM on 08/31/2017). Hence forth P shall serve D a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 08/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myles v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Chantal Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Y. Myles
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?