Reberger v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Defendant: Romeo Aranas, Harold Mike Byrne, Quentin Byrne, Barbara K Cegavske, Dwayne Deal, James Dzurenda, Timothy Filson, Nancy Flores, William Gittere, Adam Paul Laxalt, Carol Meyer, Associate Warden Jennifer Nash, Pharmacy Personnel, Brian Sandoval, Tony Slonim and David Tristan
Case Number: 3:2017cv00552
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE granting ECF No. 158 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Denney's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 147 ) is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED. Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 120 ), is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as detailed herein. The remaining claims proceeding in this action are referred to Magistrate Judge Denny to conduct a settlement conference. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have to and including July 25, 2022, to file an opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 120 ).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have to and including August 1, 2022, to file an opposition to Defendants Meyer and Slonim's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 121 ). (ECF No. 129 Motion to extend time terminated.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER: On May 20, 2022, Defendants filed their Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 120 , 121 ) in this action. To date, Plaintiff has failed to oppose the motions. Plaintiff shall be given an additional twenty (20) days from the date of this order within which to file a response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 120 , 121 ). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 6/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDERED that the Report andRecommendation (ECF No. 119 ) is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Reberger's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 111 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FRCP 4(m) (ECF No. 89 ). IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendants: HAROLD MIKE BYRNE and TIMOTHY FILSON for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's Notice of Intention to Dismiss (ECF No. 89 ) pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/19/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDERED that United States Magistrate Judge Cobb's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 90 ), is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Slonim's Motion to Dismiss, or Motion for a More Definite Statement (ECF No. 68 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 75 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 68 Motion to Dismiss due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Defendants' counsel shall file a response to Plaintiff's motions (ECF Nos. 51 and 52 ) on or before Friday, July 9, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants have until February 23, 2021, to respond to ECF No. 30 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - Plaintiff's "Motion for Extra $50 on NDOC Copy Machine" (ECF No. 28 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's copy work limit shall be increased by $50.00. Because this allowance will provide Plaintiff up to 500 copies, he should use this allowance judiciously. The Court will likely not look favorably upon any future requests for copy allowance increase. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order extending copy work to the Chief of Inmate Services for NDOP (P.O. Box 7011 Carson City, NV 89702) so that the funds can be properly allocated (Mailed to Inmate Services on 1/7/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED; NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account; Clerk directed to send a copy of this order to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (E-service to Finance and mailed to NDOC C hief on 12/8/2020); Clerk directed to e-serve NV AG with a copy of this order and a copy of ECF No. 15 Complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 12/8/2020); service must be perfected within (90) days from the date of this order; AG to advise Court within (21) days of the date of entry of this order re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; plaintiff to file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, a nd specifying a full name and address for the defendant(s); answer/response due within 60 days for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; this case is no longer stayed. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - This action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to pay the $400.00 filing fee in compliance with this Court's November 9, 2018, order (ECF No. 5 ). Clerk shall close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the IFP Application (ECF No. 1 ) is DENIED, and the Motion for Screening (ECF No. 4 ) is DENIED as moot; if Plaintiff does not pay the $350 filing fee and $50 administrative fee in full by 12/7/2018; the Court may dismiss the action without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reberger v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romeo Aranas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Mike Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara K Cegavske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Filson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Paul Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Warden Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacy Personnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Slonim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tristan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Reberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?