Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management et al

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity and Sierra Club
Defendant: Michael Nedd, U.S. Bureau of Land Management and Ryan Zinke
Case Number: 3:2017cv00553
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 37 Further Revised Joint Case Management Report. Supplement to the administrative record due by 5/23/2018. Motions challenging the content and scope of the supplement to the administrative record due on or before 6/6/2018. See order for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 17, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Order on Motion (ECF No. 35 ) is withdrawn as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 30, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Motion to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to Challenge the Content and Scope of the Administrative Record. Deadline to file motion challenging administrative record be extended to 05/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity et al v. U.S. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Julie Cavanaugh-Bill
Represented By: Clare Lakewood
Represented By: Michael Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Julie Cavanaugh-Bill
Represented By: Clare Lakewood
Represented By: Michael Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Nedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?