De Loera et al v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Luis De Loera and Malessa De Loera
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation, Christopher Chavarin, Harrahs Lake Tahoe LLC, Harvey's Tahoe Management Company, Inc. and Adam Lawler
Case Number: 3:2017cv00575
Filed: December 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 72 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 70 Status Report. The parties shall submit a stipulation for dismissal with prejudice by 7/2/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting ECF No. 62 Motion to Substitute Attorney Katherine F. Parks in for Attorney Lora A. Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 60 Stipulation : Answer to ECF No. 47 Crossclaim due Friday, 6/1/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 50 Stipulation : Cross-Defendants Adam Lawler's and Christopher Chavarin's Response to ECF No. 47 Crossclaim due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED that Harvey's Tahoe Management Company, Inc's demand for security costs (ECF No. 32 ) is GRANTED. Malessa De Loera and Luis De Loera are each ordered to post $500.00 in security for Harvey's Tahoe Management Compan y, Inc. and in compliance with N.R.S. § 18.130. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Adam Lawler's demand for security costs (ECF No. 33 ) is GRANTED. Malessa De Loera and Luis De Loera are each ordered to post $500.00 in security f or Adam Lawler and in compliance with N.R.S. § 18.130. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Christopher Chavarin's demand for security costs (ECF No. 34 ) is GRANTED. Malessa De Loera and Luis De Loera are each ordered to post $500.00 in security for Christopher Chavarin and in compliance with N.R.S. § 18.130. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Stipulation to Dismiss Cuases of Action with Prejudice against Defendant Caesars Entertainment Corporation. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Loera et al v. Caesars Entertainment Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caesars Entertainment Corporation
Represented By: Mitchell J Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Chavarin
Represented By: Brad M. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrahs Lake Tahoe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey's Tahoe Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gary W Call
Represented By: Mitchell J Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Lawler
Represented By: Brad M. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis De Loera
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Capozzi
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malessa De Loera
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Capozzi
Represented By: Michael C. Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?