PICCININI et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: GEORGE ELDRIDGE & SON, INC. and MARY KIM PICCININI
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv00584
Filed: September 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42:1396 - Tort Negligence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Stipulation of Dismissal (ECF No. 70 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. (Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 51 ) terminated). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Joint Motion. The Court extends the current stay of all proceedings (ECF No. 66 ) until May 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Motion to Stay Case until March 12, 2020. Settlement documents or Motion to lift stay due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting ECF No. 63 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 55 Motion to Strike due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE of Plaintiff MARY KIM PICCININI's claims only; granting ECF No. 61 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/31/2019. (Plaintiff Mary Kim Piccinini terminated.) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting ECF No. 57 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to ECF No. 55 Motion to Strike. Responses due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting ECF No. 53 Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF No. 51 Motion for Summary Judgment. Response due by 12/27/2019. Reply due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 46 Response re ECF No. 45 Motion to Strike due by Friday 11/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting ECF No. 20 Stipulation : Answer to complaint due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 9 ) is DENIED as to Plaintiffs' First and Second Claims for relief. The motion to dismiss is GRANTED as to Plaintiffs' Fourth Claim for relief. It is further ordered th at Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Claim for Relief for Res Ipsa Loquitur as a substantive claim is GRANTED. This will not preclude Plaintiffs from raising, to the extent it is supported by the evidence, the doctrine of Res Ipsa Loquitur as a procedural rule of evidence. It is further ordered that Plaintiffs' prayer for punitive damages and attorney's fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting ECF No. 15 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 14 Response re ECF No. 9 Motion to Dismiss due by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting ECF No. 12 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Opposition to ECF No. 9 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 2/21/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PICCININI et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE ELDRIDGE & SON, INC.
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Travis W. Gerber
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Gerber
Represented By: Sean P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY KIM PICCININI
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Travis W. Gerber
Represented By: Zachary Aaron Gerber
Represented By: Sean P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?