Robinson v. State of Nevada et al

Plaintiff: Alama Robinson
Defendant: Division of Public and Behavioral Health and State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2017cv00611
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Stipulation to Extend re ECF No. 58 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request): Lyon County's reply to ECF No. 64 Response due by 2/28/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting ECF No. 66 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 64 Response re ECF No. 58 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER approving ECF No. 61 Stipulation re ECF No. 58 Motion for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 1/31/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Stipulation : Response to ECF No. 57 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PROTECTIVE ORDER re 47 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - State of Nevada and Lyon County's motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 23 , 32 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to be renewed as a motions for summary judgment at the close of discovery. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting ECF No. 29 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to file response to ECF No. 23 State of Nevada's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response due by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting ECF No. 24 Confidentiality Stipulation. The state employee personnel records which may be maintained by the State of Nevada, Division of Human Resource Management or the personnel office of the Department of Health and Human S ervices and Division of Public and Behavioral Health, and which may be discoverable in this action, are confidential and may be released and disclosed in this litigation, Robinson v. State, et al., United States District Court Case No. 3:17-cv-00611- HDM-WGC, only in accordance with the terms and provisions of the foregoing Stipulation, said terms and provisions being incorporated into this Order by this reference as though fully set forth herein. Although the parties may agree to be bound by the confidentiality terms of this Order beyond the conclusion of this lawsuit, the dismissal of this action will terminate the jurisdiction of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Public and Behavioral Health
Represented By: Shannon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: Shannon Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alama Robinson
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?