McKnight v. Warden Baker et al
Petitioner: Derrick Lamar McKnight
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General and Warden Baker
Case Number: 3:2017cv00681
Filed: November 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - It is ordered that Petitioner's motion to extend the discovery deadline and corresponding amended petition (ECF No. 44 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including October 18, 2021, to complete discovery. Petitioner will have up to and including January 18, 2022, to file an amended petition. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Petitioner's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (eight request) (ECF No. 39 ) is Granted. The Amended Petition due by 9/7/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting ECF No. 37 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have up to and including June 9, 2021, to file an Amended Petition. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/10/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time (ECF No. 35 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Petitioner will have up to and including March 10, 2021, to file an amended petition. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 33 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including November 10, 2020, to file an Amended Petition. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting ECF No. 31 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting ECF No. 28 Motion to Extend Time: Amended Petition due by 4/14/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Motion to Extend Time: Amended Petition due by 1/15/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting ECF No. 23 Petitioner's unopposed motion for extension of time. Amended Petition due by 10/17/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER withdrawing provisional appointment of FPD and appointing Michelle Ryan, Esq. as counsel for Petitioner; granting Ms. Ryan permission to appear pro hac vice in all federal proceedings related to this matter during the pende ncy of this appointment and waiving the requirements for a verified petition for permission to appear pro hac vice and payment of $250 fee; giving Petitioner 60 days to file a counseled amended petition; directing Clerk to provide counsel, upon her request, a single set of electronic copies of all prior filings herein; directing Clerk to send a copy of this order to the Petitioner at the last institutional address in the record (mailed 5/20/2019). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Petitioner's motion for counsel (ECF No. 9 ) is granted. FPDis provisionally appointed to represent Petitioner. FPD shall undertake direct representation of Petitioner or indicate to inability to do so by 4/13/2019. If FPD undertakes representation, then amended petition is due by 5/13/2019. Clerk shall e-serve the FPD a copy of the petition (ECF No. 6 ), and a copy of this order. (E-service 3/14/2019; Petition via NEF regeneration.) Respondents need not respond t o the petition (ECF No. 6 ), unless later directed by the Court. Petitioner's motion for leave to amend (ECF No. 10 ) is denied as moot. Petitioner's motion for relief from judgment (ECF No. 11 ) is denied as moot. Petit ioner's motion for a copy of the docket sheet (ECF No. 18 ) is granted. Clerk shall send a copy of the docket sheet to Petitioner. ( Docket sheet and instant order mailed to P at LCC on 3/14/2019.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that Respondents' motions for enlargement of time (ECF Nos. 12 , 14 ) are granted. Respondents need not file a response to the petition for a writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 6 ) until after the court rules on petitioner's motions for leave to amend (ECF No. 10 ) and relief from judgment (ECF No. 11 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that directing the Clerk to file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and motion for appointment of counsel; motion for appointment of counsel is denied; grounds 4, 7(1), 7(3), 8(B), 10, and 12 of the petition are dismissed; C lerk directed to add AG as counsel for respondents and electronically serve respondents a copy of the petition and this order (e-served on 05/21/2018); Clerk directed to send petitioner a copy of the petition (mailed on 05/21/2018); respondents have until 07/05/18 to answer or otherwise respond to the petition; petitioner has (45) days from the date the answer was served to file a reply; paper copies of any electronically filed exhibits need not be provided to chambers or to the staff attorney, unless later directed by the Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that ECF No. 1 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied; filing fee ($5) due 1/4/18; clerk directed to send petitioner 2 copies of this order (mailed to P on 12/5/17). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKnight v. Warden Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Lamar McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?