Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association, Inc. and SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00699
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's demand for security costs (ECF No. 8 ) is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association, Inc.'s motion to dismiss (ECF No. 6 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The court dismisses claim two (breach of NRS 116.1113) and claim three (wrongful foreclosure). The court does not dismiss claim one. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 1, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 24 SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC's Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference scheduled for 3/2/2018 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 28, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 20 Motion for Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion for Donna M. Wittig, Esq. to Appear Telephonically at Case Managememnt Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curti Ranch Two Maintenance Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?