Bonta v. Washoe County et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Bonta
Defendant: Reno, City of and Washoe, County of
Case Number: 3:2018cv00012
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of DISMISSAL pursuant to ECF No. 53 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 2, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 49 Stipulation : Answer/response to ECF No. 25 Amended Complaint; and, Response to ECF No. 47 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 18, 2018 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 28 , 29 ) are DENIED; the Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery (ECF No. 35 ) and the Motion to Substitute Party (ECF No. 34 ) are GRANTED; Jill Gonzales and Bryce Mower, as guardians ad litem for Lisa Bonta, are SUBSTITUTED for Lisa Bonta. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 25, 2018 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Motion to Strike (ECF No. 31 ) is GRANTED, and the Response (ECF No. 30 ) is STRICKEN; a consolidated response to the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 28 , 29 ) of no more than twenty-four (24) pages is due by 10/2/20 18, and any replies of no more than twelve (12) pages are due within seven (7) days thereafter; Failure to comply may constitute a consent to the granting of the motions to dismiss under Local Rule 7-2(d). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 1, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff to file Oppositions to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, if any Defendant should file such a Motion, up to and including 09/05/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 24, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF Nos. 7 , 9 Motions to Dismiss, with leave to amend within 21 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 23, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO PARTIES re ECF No. 22 Notice of Unavailability of Counsel Terri Keyser-Cooper. The parties should note that there is no local rule in our Court providing for the filing of same, and no federal rule supporting same. While the Court is not precluding anyone from filing same, and as a matter of professionalism and courtesy they should be considered, the parties should understand that these filing have no legal significance. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 15, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Oral Argument re ECF Nos. 7 , 9 Motions to Dismiss currently set for 1:30 PM, Tuesday, June 12, 2018, in RENO COURTROOM 3, before Judge Robert C. Jones is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Oral Argument is RESCHEDULED to 1:30 PM, Monday, June 18, 2018, RENO COURTROOM 3, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 23, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 8 Stipulation re ECF No. 7 Motion to Dismiss: Response due by 3/14/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 14, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's ECF No. 3 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonta v. Washoe County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bonta
Represented By: Terri Keyser-Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?