August 29, 2023 |
Filing
228
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the Court amends its prior judgments in this case as noted below.The Clerk of Court is directed to add references to Ramon Olivas and Kelly Belanger to the judgment currently docketed at ECF No. 184 and add a reference to H. Byrne to the judgment currently docketed at ECF No. 178 under Rule 60(a). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
|
June 9, 2022 |
Filing
203
ORDER - It is therefore ordered that Shields motion to alter or amend judgment (ECF No. 189 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Shields motion to alter or amend judgment (ECF No. 195 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Shield s unopposed motion for missing documents (ECF No. 198 ) is denied as specified herein. It is further ordered that Shields second motion for missing documents (ECF No. 202 ) is denied as specified herein. This case will remain closed. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
|
March 21, 2022 |
Filing
156
ORDER TO TRANSPORT PLAINTIFF AND ORDER TO TEST NDOC INMATE FOR IN-PERSON COURT PROCEEDINGS - IT IS ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections (NDOC) shall transport inmate Douglas E. Shields, NDOC #1049699, to the Bruce R. Thompson Feder al Courthouse, 400 S. Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada, to personally attend the Jury Trial scheduled for April 18, 2022, at 9:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before the Honorable Miranda M. Du, Chief U.S. District Judge, and to return him to the Cour thouse daily until the jury trial is completed. The Clerk of Court shall provide a courtesy copy of this order to the U.S. Marshal's Office in Reno. (Emailed to USM 3/21/2022.) Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/21/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 6, 2021 |
Filing
116
ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of U.S. Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb (ECF No. 110 ) is accepted and adopted in full. Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. 111 ) is overruled. Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunctio n against transferring him out of his current institution (ECF No. 105 ) is denied. Clerk is directed to strike Plaintiff's Reply (ECF No. 115 ) filed without first obtaining the Court's leave. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
March 8, 2021 |
Filing
99
ORDERED Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 79 ) is granted in part, and denied in part, as specified herein. Defendants' motion to seal (ECF No. 80 ) is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to unsea l Defendants' Exhibit F to their motion for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 81 , 81 -1). Exhibit F, which is a CD containing audio recordings, will be available for review upon request in the Clerk of Court's office in the Bruce R. Thompson Courthouse and Federal Building in Reno, Nevada. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 28, 2021 |
Filing
96
ORDER granting ECF No. 95 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition (ECF No. 92 ) to the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 79 ) is due March 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/28/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
December 15, 2020 |
Filing
94
ORDER granting ECF No. 93 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants' Reply to the Response (ECF No. 92 ) re ECF No. 79 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by January 28, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
May 5, 2020 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting ECF No. 70 Motion for Extension of Dispositive Motion Deadline. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
August 14, 2019 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Plaintiff's Motion. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Motions due by 12/6/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/6/2020. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing
9
ORDER SETTING INMATE EARLY MEDIATION CONFERENCE. An Inmate Early Mediation Conference is set for 5/7/2019 at 2:30 P.M. in Reno Courtroom 2. The Court will appoint a mediator in this case. The Attorney General's Office will make the n ecessary arrangements for plaintiff to appear by video and will provide Katie Lynn Ogden at 775-686-5758 with the video conference reservation number and telephone number at which the plaintiff can be reached. The mediation statements shall be recei ved by chambers at 400 S. Virginia Street, Suite 405, Reno, NV 89501 no later than 4/30/2019 at 4:00 P.M. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 2/13/2019 correct filed date (KW).
|