Port Of Subs, Inc. v. THOMAS et al

Plaintiff: Port of Subs, Inc.
Defendant: Claudia Casey, Michael Casey, John Getto, Getto Subs, LLC, Port Fallon, Inc., Linda M. Thomas and Thomas B. Thomas
Case Number: 3:2018cv00085
Filed: February 22, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Michael Casey, Claudia Casey, John Getto and Getto Subs, LLC. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 20, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 44 Stipulation to Vacate and Continue Settlement Conference scheduled for June 27, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 26, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 34 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to File Reply to ECF No. 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Reply due by 5/7/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 3, 2018 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants Thomas B. Thomas, Linda M. Thomas and Port Fallon Inc to Respond to ECF No. 1 Complaint. Defendants' Answer/response due by 4/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 27, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 22 Stipulation for Extension of Time for defendants Michael Casey, Claudia Casey, John Getto and Getto Subs, LLC to respond to ECF No. 5 motion for preliminary injunction. Response due by 4/10/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Port Of Subs, Inc. v. THOMAS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia Casey
Represented By: John J. Gezelin
Represented By: Frank W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Casey
Represented By: John J. Gezelin
Represented By: Frank W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Getto
Represented By: John J. Gezelin
Represented By: Frank W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getto Subs, LLC
Represented By: John J. Gezelin
Represented By: Frank W. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Fallon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port of Subs, Inc.
Represented By: James M Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?