Burns v. Sandoval et al
Plaintiff: David Burns
Defendant: Harold Byrne, Clark, William Gittere, Hammel, Healer, Hal Hollingsworth, Walter Romero, Tasheena Sandoval, C/O Travis and Underwood
Case Number: 3:2018cv00086
Filed: February 23, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDERED that Plaintiff's objection (ECF No. 121 ) to the Report and Recommendation is overruled. The Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 120 ) is accepted and adopted in full. Defendants' motion for summary judgment ( ECF No. 105 ) is granted. Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 111 ) is denied. Plaintiff's motion for an adjudication as to liability (ECF No. 104 ) is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order (ECF No. 103 ) is denied as moot. Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting ECF No. 106 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting ECF No. 100 Motion to Extend Time : Status Report due by 7/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER - The Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin (ECF No. 84 ) is accepted and adopted in full.Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 64 ) is granted. Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 64 -1). Counts will proceed or are dismissed as specified herein.Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 51 ) and Second Request for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 65 ) are denied as moot.Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER - Motion for Order Compelling Discovery (ECF No. 70 ) is DENIED.Motion for Sanctions (ECF No. 71 ) is DENIED. Motion to Extend Time for Discovery (ECF No. 72 ) is unopposed and is GRANTED as follows:- Discovery shall be completed no later than Monday, March 30, 2020;- Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than Thursday, April 30, 2020;- The joint pretrial order shall be filed no later than Monday, June 1, 2020, or 30 days after the decision of any pending dispositive motions.Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to file Dispositive Motion (ECF No. 75 ) is GRANTED. As stated above, dispositive motions are due on Thursday, April 30, 2020.Motio n for Inquiry on Previously sent Motions (ECF No. 76 ) is GRANTED. Other motions submitted by Plaintiff concerning filing a third amended complaint (ECF Nos. 64 and 65 ), and for the appointment of counsel (ECF No. 79 ) will be addressed in subsequent orders in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. 26 Motion: Early Mediation Conference Statement due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Sandoval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Byrne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasheena Sandoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Travis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?