Winkler v. Baca et al

Petitioner: Gary Joseph Winkler
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2018cv00115
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - Respondents' motion to dismiss the petition as untimely (ECF No. 14 ) is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Petitioner's motion for leave to file a sur-reply (ECF No. 30 ) is denied. Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. Clerk shall enter final judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that Petitioner's motion for production of transcripts (ECF No. 22 ) is denied without prejudice; and Petitioner's "motion to oppose respondents' opposition" (ECF No. 24 ), construed as a reply, is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting ECF No. 25 Petitioner's Second Motion for Enlargement of Time to file response to ECF No. 14 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 11/2/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion for Extension of Time to file response to ECF No. 14 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Clerk of Court strike Mr. Fasthorse's letter (ECF No. 12 ) from the docket. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - Respondents' motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 10 ) is granted. Respondents will have until July 6, 2018, to respond to the petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF No. 5 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying Petitioner's ECF No. 7 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that petitioner's application to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. 1 is granted; Clerk directed to file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus ECF No. 1 -1; Clerk directed to electronically serve the AG with a copy of the petition a nd this order along with regenerated NEF of remaining filings (e-service and NEF regenerated on 3/23/2018); respondents will have until 05/22/2018 to answer or otherwise respond to the petition; any exhibits filed by the parties must be filed with a separate index of exhibits identifying the exhibits by number or letter; hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits must be forwarded for this case to the Reno Clerks Office; petitioner will have (30) days from service of the an swer, motion to dismiss or other response to mail a reply or response to the Clerk for filing. See Order for specific details and information. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the above-entitled action is hereby transferred to the unofficial northern division of this Court for all further proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall transfer and reopen this matter as a new action under a new docket number in the northern division, and the present action under the present docket number shall be closed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winkler v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Amanda C Sage
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Amanda C Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Joseph Winkler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?