Hidalgo v. Baca et al

Petitioner: Luis A Hidalgo, Jr.
Respondent: Isidro Baca, Nevada Attorney General and Nevada, State of
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt, Megan Hoffman and Rene Valladares
Case Number: 3:2018cv00153
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's third motion for enlargement of time (ECF No. 25 ) is granted. Petitioner will have to and including December 19, 2018, to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus in this case and/or to seek other appropriate relief. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 9, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 23 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 20, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's pro se motion to proceed with appointment of alternate counsel (ECF No. 18 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 21, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 6, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's motion for withdrawal and appointment of new counsel (ECF No. 13 ) is denied; Petitioner's motion for clarification (ECF No. 12 ) is denied as moot; Clerk instructed to send a copy of this Order to Petitioner (mailed to P on 8/6/2018). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 1, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: ECF No. 13 Motion for Appointment of Counsel : On or before August 10, 2018, counsel David Neidert, Esq. must respond to Petitioner's Motion. In his response, Mr. Neidert must address whether he has met with Petitioner in connection with this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 12, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's appointed counsel, David Neidert, Esq., must respond to the allegations raised in Petitioner's pro se filings (ECF Nos. 12 , 13 ) under seal by 7/22/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 23, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the provisional appointment of FPD as counsel for Petitioner is withdrawn; David Neidert is appointed as counsel; amended petition due by 8/21/2018; respondents shall have 60 days from service of amended petition to file an answer/r espond ; hard copy of any record exhibits shall be sent to the Reno Clerk's Office; Clerk directed to provide Mr. Neidert, upon request, with a single set of electronic copies of all prior filings; Clerk also directed to send a copy of this order to Petitioner (mailed to petitioner at NNCC on 4/23/2018). See Order for further details and instructions. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 16, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ECF No. 1 IFP Application is denied. $5.00 filing fee due by 5/17/2018. Clerk shall file the petition, and the motion for counsel as granted, and and the motion to extend time as denied. FPD is provisionally appointed, and shall under take direct representation, or indicate inability to do so, by 5/17/2018. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for Rs, and make informal E-service of this order. Rs counsel shall enter a notice of appearance by 5/8/2018. Clerk shall send copy this order to FPD and CJA Coordinator. (E-service (NEF) 4/17/2018) Clerk shall send P 2 copies this order. P shall return 1 copy with payment of filing feed. (Mailed 2 cps 4/17/2018.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hidalgo v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Represented By: Heather D. Procter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Megan Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis A Hidalgo, Jr.
Represented By: David K. Neidert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?