Bonnet vs Nevada, State of, et al

Plaintiff: Bobby Bonnet
Defendant: Nevada Department of Transportation Division and Nevada, State of
Case Number: 3:2018cv00159
Filed: April 16, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 30 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to ECF No. 29 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (First Request). Plaintiff's response due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 7, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY - DUPLICATE ENTRY ORDER granting ECF No. 17 Stipulation to File an Amended Complaint in Lieu of a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; ECF No. 8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss withdrawn. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) Modified on 6/7/2018 to denote duplicate (KW).
May 21, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting ECF No. 11 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Fi<le Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 8 ). Response due by 6/6/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonnet vs Nevada, State of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Bonnet
Represented By: Mark L. Mausert
Represented By: Cody Oldham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Transportation Division
Represented By: Dominika Joanna Batten
Represented By: Cameron P. Vandenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State of
Represented By: Dominika Joanna Batten
Represented By: Cameron P. Vandenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?