Goin v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Juanita Joan Goin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2018cv00207
Filed: May 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 20 Stipulation for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 6/24/2019 to reflect ECF No. 19 Motion denied as moot pursuant to footnote page 3 (DRM).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that accepts and adopts the report and recommendation (ECF No. 17 ); Goin's motion for reversal and remand (ECF No. 14 ) is granted; the Commissioner's cross-motion to affirm (ECF No. 15 ) is denied; this case is remanded for further administrative proceedings. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 3/18/2019.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving ECF No. 6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa A. Palmer on behalf of plaintiff Juanita Joan Goin and approving Designation of Local Counsel Hal Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/14/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Plaintiff's IFP application (ECF No. 1 ) is GRANTED; the complaint shall PROCEED; Clerk directed to FILE the complaint (ECF No. 1 -1); Clerk shall SERVE Commissioner SSA by sending a copy of the Summons and Complaint by certified mail to the 2 addresses outlined in order: Regional Chief Counsel ; and U. S. Attorney General. (Cert Mail ## 7013 1710 0001 6894 2853, 7013 1710 0001 6894 2846); Clerk shall ISSUE a summons to the U.S. At torney for the District of Nevada and deliver summons and complaint to USM for service (Summons, complaint and copy of this order to USM on 5/9/2018 ); and Plaintiff shall serve Defendant a copy every pleading submitted for consideration, together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Joan Goin
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Margaret I. Branick-Abilla
Represented By: Dayle Elieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?