United States of America v. Sundell, Jr.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Curt H. Sundell, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00215
Filed: May 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 16 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting ECF No. 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File a Response to Complaint ECF No. 1 (Third Request). Curt H. Sundell, Jr.'s response/answer due 9/13/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting ECF No. 7 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File a Response to ECF No. 1 Plaintiff's Complaint (Second Request). Defendant's answer/response due by 8/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting ECF No. 5 Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. 1 ). Defendant's answer/response due by 7/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sundell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curt H. Sundell, Jr.
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?