Anderson v. Eighth Judicial District Court et al
Petitioner: Blake L Anderson
Respondent: Nevada, State of and Eighth Judicial District Court
Case Number: 3:2018cv00414
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice to the filing of a new petition in a new action with either payment of the filing fee or a properly completed pauper application; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close case; a certificate of appealability is denied; Clerk directed to sent Petitioner (2) copies of form application to proceed in forma pauperis for inmate and a Section 2254 habeas petition form and one copy of the instructions for each form (mailed to P on 10/05/2018); pending motions ECF Nos. #9 and #10 are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Order Shortening Time on A Motion for Summary Judgment by Petitioner Blake L Anderson. Responses due by 10/17/2018.(LH)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION - Request for Summary Judgment by Petitioner Blake L Anderson. Responses due by 10/17/2018.(LH)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE - Request the Mandamus Petition After Being Granted, That The Matter Be Remanded To The District Court For The Criminal Matter To Be Dismissed With Prejudice, by Blake L Anderson. (LH)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Request for Submission on Order Shortening Time o Mandamus Petitioner, filed by Blake L Anderson. (KW)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE - Request for Submission, by Blake L Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope image) (DRM)
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of New Petition by Blake L Anderson. (LH)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE - Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-00414-MMD-CBC. (no image attached) (DRM)
August 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (LH)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Exhibits in Support of ECF No. #1 -1 Mandamus Petition by Blake L Anderson. (LH)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE : No IFP Application, or Filing Fee was received with Initiating Documents, by Blake L Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Petition for a Writ of Mandamus, #2 Motion for a Hearing, #3 Image of Envelope)(LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Eighth Judicial District Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eighth Judicial District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Blake L Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?