Assist-2-Sell, Inc. v. MCRAY, Inc.
Plaintiff: Assist-2-Sell, Inc.
Defendant: MCRAY, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00462
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Assist-2-Sell, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gronek, Scott)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Assist-2-Sell, Inc.. (Gronek, Scott)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant MCRAY, Inc.. (Humphrey, Louis)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IA 11-1 and IC 2-1. This Court has no record of Attorney Christopher Blandford being admitted to the U.S. District Court and the Attorney is not registered with CM/ECF. Attorney advised to comply with the admission requirements of this Court. Admission forms are available on the Court's website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon complying with LR IA 11-1, you are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program. (no image attached) (BLG)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Minute Order Removal Case, #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant MCRAY, Inc.. (Humphrey, Louis)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/1/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/16/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 1, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (BLG)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Washoe County, Nevada, Case Number CV18-01822, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5261867) by MCRAY, Inc.. Proof of service due by 12/5/2018. (Humphrey, Louis) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assist-2-Sell, Inc. v. MCRAY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCRAY, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Edward Humphrey
Represented By: Christopher Lee Blandford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Assist-2-Sell, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A. Gronek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?