Tran v. NuVasive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tuan Tran
Defendant: NuVasive, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00470
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION re Discovery Protective Order by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 19 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant NuVasive, Inc. (Ferguson, Sarah)
November 30, 2018 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/30/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Paris Rich.IT IS ORDERED, a Telephonic Hearing Re: Defendant NuVasive, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #7 ) is set for Wednesday, 12/12/2018 at 8:30 AM in before Judge Howard D. McKibben. All participants shall only appear telephonically.Further, participants shall call AT&T no later than five minutes prior to the hearing at 1 (877) 336-1839 and provide Access Code 3246567 with Security Code 0413. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PR)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Case Management Conference held on 11/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Crtrm Administrator: LGM; Pla Counsel: Stephen Osborne; Def Counsel: Robert Mayfield and Sarah Ferguson; Recording start and end times: 9:59:05 - 10:16:35; Courtroom: 1; The Court and counsel discuss the parties' case management report (ECF No. #15 ). The Court directs counsel to prepare and file a proposed protective order which includes a clawback provision for the Court's consideration by no later than December 1, 2018. The Court directs counsel to prepare and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order calculating the deadlines beginning from December 1, 2018. A further case management conference is set for 2/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Out-of-state counsel shall be allowed to appear telephonically and shall dial 877-336-1829 at least five (5) minutes prior to the hearing to be properly connected into the courtroom. The access code is 2809752 and the security code is 18470. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Defendant NuVasive, Inc. (Ferguson, Sarah)
October 30, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. (Ferguson, Sarah)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Robert C. Mayfield is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 11/13/2018 COMPLIED (WJ).
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Tuan Tran. Replies due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1 - Opp to Def Motion to Dismiss)(Osborne, Stephen)
October 22, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/22/2018. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Case Management Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. Out-of-town counsel shall be permitted to file a motion for telephonic appearance after the joint case management report has been filed and prior to the case management conference. The parties shall jointly file a case management report by no later than the close of business on Tuesday, October 30, 2018. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving ECF No. #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert C. Mayfield on behalf of Defendant and approving Designation of Local Counsel Matthew C. Addison. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/17/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. (Addison, Matthew)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Mayfield and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew C. Addison (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5278866) by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. (Addison, Matthew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. Responses due by 10/24/2018. (Addison, Matthew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel R. Craig Mayfield to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/23/2018. (no image attached) (WJ)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Stephen H. Osborne is advised to review and update his user account information. (no image attached) (BLG)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Nancy A. Hoy re #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant NuVasive, Inc.. (Addison, Matthew)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/4/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 3, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (BLG)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NuVasive, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for NuVasive, Inc. added. (Addison, Matthew)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV18-01743, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5266448) by NuVasive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Addison, Matthew) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. NuVasive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tuan Tran
Represented By: Stephen H. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NuVasive, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Ashley Ferguson
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Represented By: Robert Craig Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?