U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2018cv00480
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Howard D McKibben
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting ECF No. #8 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association to Respond to Complaint (Second Request). Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association answer due 12/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, #7 Order on Stipulation,,, by Defendant Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association. (Ayarbe, Karen)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting ECF No. #6 Stipulation To Extend Time re ECF No. #1 Complaint (First Request) : Defendant Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association's answer/response due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association. (Ayarbe, Karen)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Jung, Rock)
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association. (DRM)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Summons to Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association to be issued by Plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Jung, Rock)
October 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/9/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Danielle Cacciabaudo. Re: Complaint #1 . On 10/8/2018, plaintiff U.S. Bank Trust filed a complaint for quiet title with this court. Because the subject of this action is situated in Sparks, Washoe County, Nevada, IT IS ORDERED that this action be transferred to the unofficial northern division of the District of Nevada and assigned to a new district judge and magistrate judge. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 8, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5271750) by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. As Trustee for LSF8 Master Participation Trust. Proof of service due by 1/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jung, Rock) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. v. Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Villas Condominium Homeowners Association
Represented By: Karen M. Ayarbe
Represented By: Gayle A. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Rock K. Jung
Represented By: Edgar C Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?