Konvicka v. Bertucci et al

Plaintiff: John T. Konvicka
Defendant: American International Tooling and Lee Bertucci
Case Number: 3:2018cv00487
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Early Neutral Evaluation Session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/29/2019 at 9:00 AM in Reno Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr.. Written evaluation statements due in Clerk's Office by 4:00 PM, Tuesday, 1/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 26, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING ECF No. #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Susan Baird Motschiedler for Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel Rew R. Goodenow. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/26/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 26, 2018 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Susan Baird Motschiedler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rew R. Goodenow (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5334095) by Defendants American International Tooling, Lee Bertucci. (Goodenow, Rew)
November 16, 2018 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by American International Tooling, Lee Bertucci that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Berkon Investments, LLC for American International Tooling, Lee Bertucci added. (Goodenow, Rew)
November 15, 2018 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Susan Baird Motschiedler to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/30/2018. (no image attached) (BLG)
November 14, 2018 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by American International Tooling, Lee Bertucci. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/29/2018.(Nikkel, Ashley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
November 2, 2018 5 DECLARATION OF SERVICE re ECF No. #1 Complaint, ECF No. #2 Summons Issued. American International Tooling served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018; Lee Bertucci served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service) (KR)
October 16, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/16/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
October 12, 2018 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KW)
October 12, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American International Tooling, Lee Bertucci re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KW)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against American International Tooling, Lee Bertucci (Filing fee $400 PAID Receipt No. NVRNO004309), filed by John T. Konvicka. Proof of service due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KW)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for ENE. (WJ)
October 12, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Konvicka v. Bertucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Tooling
Represented By: Susan Baird Motschiedler
Represented By: Ashley Christine Nikkel
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Bertucci
Represented By: Susan Baird Motschiedler
Represented By: Ashley Christine Nikkel
Represented By: Rew R Goodenow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Konvicka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?