Intlekofer v. Jones
Petitioner: Robert J. Intlekofer
Respondent: Darlene Jones
Case Number: 3:2018cv00503
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (ECF No. #9 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re ECF No. #8 Order, filed by Petitioner Robert J. Intlekofer. Responses due by 12/25/2018. (KW)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiff's emergency motion for temporary restraining order (ECF No. #1 -1) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/15/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darlene Jones. (DRM)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION NUNC PRO TUNC, BY ORDER DATED OCTOBER 24, 2018, filed by Robert J. Intlekofer. Proof of service due by 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DRM)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Filing Fee Payment: $ 400.00, receipt number NV RNO 0004329. (LH)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER giving Plaintiff 21 days to file a complaint, either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a completed IFP application, and submit a declaration that complies with Local Rule 7-4; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff a copy of this Order and an IFP form for non-inmates (mailed 10/24/2018). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE - No IFP Application or Filing Fee Received with Initiating Document(s) submitted by Robert J. Intlekofer. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Petition for Temporary Restrainng Order With Request to Impose Security Bond; Hearing Requested, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (DRM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2018: #4 Image of Mailing Envelope) (DRM).
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Intlekofer v. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Darlene Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert J. Intlekofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?