Yerington Paiute Tribe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Yerington Paiute Tribe
Defendant: Actavis Inc., McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis plc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc., Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc., Noramco, Inc. and Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00572
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: William G Cobb
Referring Judge: Larry R Hicks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL RETURN. Transferred case opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-46355 on 12/27/2018. (JM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Ohio, Northern. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. MDL 2804. CTO-71. (no image attached) (DRM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-71) (MDL-2804) - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MDL MINUTE ORDER - TO INVOLVED CLERKS - Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-71) Finalized on 12/20/18. Please see pleading 3 in NV/3:18-cv-00572 (ECF No. #4 on USDC-NV docket). As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/20/2018. ( no image attached - ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY*** ) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-71) (MDL No. 2804) - Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Austin Tighe and Vic Feazell to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/18/2019. (no image attached) (BLG)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Austin Tighe is advised to review and update his user account information. (no image attached) (BLG)
December 4, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (BLG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5344225) by Yerington Paiute Tribe. Proof of service due by 3/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Saint-Aubin, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yerington Paiute Tribe v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yerington Paiute Tribe
Represented By: Robert F Saint-Aubin
Represented By: Vic Feazell
Represented By: Austin Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?