Penrose v. Quality Loan Service Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Herbert S Penroe and Herbert S. Penrose
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp., Greenwich Capital Financial Products, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans Servicing L.P., U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Harbor View Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-8, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, AKA "MERS", Greenwich Capital Acceptance, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, First Magnus Financial Corporation, Mr. Cooper, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, MERS, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and U.S. Bank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2018cv00576
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
Referring Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/16/2019. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to ECF No. #6 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Wittig, Donna)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. Responses due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE) (Wittig, Donna)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank, National Association. (Wittig, Donna)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/7/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/6/2018. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/21/2018. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 6, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, AKA "MERS", Mr. Cooper, Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Harbor View Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-8 that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Harbor View Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-8; Corporate Parent Merscorp Holdings Inc. for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, AKA "MERS" ; Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub1 LLC, Corporate Parent Nationstar Sub2 LLC, Other Affiliate Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors Corporation, Other Affiliate Mr. Cooper Group Inc. for Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper added. (Morgan, Melanie)
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court, Case Number CV18-02192, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5347036) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper, Mr. Cooper, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, AKA "MERS", U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Harbor View Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-8. Proof of service due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Melanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penrose v. Quality Loan Service Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Capital Financial Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association, as Trustee for Harbor View Mortgage Loan Trust 2005-8
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, AKA "MERS"
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwich Capital Acceptance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Magnus Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Cooper
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert S Penroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert S. Penrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?