Hawkins v. Washoe County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Joshua Hawkins
Defendant: Washoe County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2018cv00578
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Nevada District Court
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: William G Cobb
2 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 7 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with ECF No. #5 Order; Clerk is directed to close case and enter judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/18/2019) (KW).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER that Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #1 is DENIED without prejudice; Clerk directed to SEND plaintiff instructions and approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis (attached hereto and e-served to p via NNCC Law Library on 12/11/2018); plaintiff shall either complete the application to proceed in forma pauperis with complete financial attachments or pay the full $400 filing fee by 1/10/2019; if plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result; Clerk to retain the complaint ECF No. #1 -1, but shall not file at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Instructions, #2 IFP Form)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 11, 2018 4 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb for all further proceedings consistent with his jurisdiction. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:18-cv-0578-MMD-WGC. (no image attached) (WJ)
December 11, 2018 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/11/2018. By Deputy Clerk: Wayne Julian. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry recuses himself/herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
December 7, 2018 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (KW)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
December 7, 2018 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Joshua Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint)(KW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Washoe County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Hawkins
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washoe County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?