Heizer v. Zephyr Heights General Improvement District

Plaintiff: Rebecca Heizer
Defendant: Zephyr Heights General Improvement District
Case Number: 3:2018cv00606
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rebecca Heizer re #3 Summons Issued. Zephyr Heights General Improvement District waiver sent on 1/8/2019, answer due 3/9/2019. (Oshinski, Rick)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/3/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zephyr Heights General Improvement District re ECF No. #1 Complaint. (KW)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rebecca Heizer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Oshinski, Rick)
January 2, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zephyr Heights General Improvement District (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5376196) by Rebecca Heizer. Proof of service due by 4/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Oshinski, Rick) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heizer v. Zephyr Heights General Improvement District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Heizer
Represented By: Rick Oshinski
Represented By: Mark Forsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zephyr Heights General Improvement District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?