Gresham v. Dzurenda et al

Plaintiff: Michael A. Gresham
Defendant: James Glenn Cox, Robert Bayer, Jackie Crawford, James Dzurenda, Howard Skolnik and James Todd Russell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00026
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
0 Judge: Carla Baldwin Carry
1 Judge: Robert C Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER regarding filing fee and ECF No. #5 Order, from Michael A. Gresham. (LH)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Plaintiff pay the full $400 filing fee for civil action by 3/29/2019; if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this Order dismissal of this action may result. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 3/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER to Judge Robert C. Jones re ECF No. #3 Order, from Michael A. Gresham. (LH) Modified on 2/27/2019 to denote RCJ(LH).
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Clerk SHALL SEND P approved IFP form and instructions. (IFP form and instructions attached hereto for distribution to P via NNCC law library) P shall file fully complete IFP or pay $400 filing fee by 2/22/2019. Clerk shall retain the complaint but shall not file it at this time. (Attachments: #1 Inmate IFP Form, #2 IFP instructions)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Robert C. Jones and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry. (WJ)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE - No IFP Application or Filing Fee Received with Initiating Document(s) by Michael A. Gresham. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gresham v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Glenn Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Skolnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Todd Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Gresham
Represented By: Northern Nevada Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?