Garmong v. Maupin, Cox & Legoy
In Re: Linda L. Garmong
Appellee: Maupin, Cox & Legoy
Appellant: Gregory O. Garmong
Case Number: 3:2019cv00116
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Miranda M Du
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to by Appellant Gregory O. Garmong. (Hebert, Carl)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to by Appellee Maupin, Cox & Legoy. Replies due by 3/7/2019. (Armstrong, Sallie)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/28/2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/27/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:19-cv-00116-MMD. (no image attached) (BLG)
February 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Larry R. Hicks. (BLG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 TRANSMITTAL to Bankruptcy Appellate Panel re U.S. District Court Case No. 3:19-cv-00116 assigned. (LH)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF TRANSFER of APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel : BAP No. NV-19-1036, ADV. NO. 3:17-ap-05043-GWZ, and Bk. Ct. No. 3:10-bk-52588-GWZ. (LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garmong v. Maupin, Cox & Legoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Linda L. Garmong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Maupin, Cox & Legoy
Represented By: Sallie B. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gregory O. Garmong
Represented By: Carl M. Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?